Trustees HALF MOON YOUNG PEOPLE'S THEATRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1010192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN HARRISON-WALLACE | Chair | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Roopa Sharma | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nutan Claire Velji | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asma Jhina | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Lewis | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Dorney | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Constantina Kleanthous | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vipul Bhatti | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Jones | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary McColgan | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Paul Wakefield | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Paul Macey | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Sarah Carolyn Nottingham | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.