Governing document LAKE DISTRICT MOUNTAIN RESCUE SEARCH DOGS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 05/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2002 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 14/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 09 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO TRAIN SEARCH DOGS AND HANDLERS TO ASSIST IN THE SEARCH AND RESCUE OF MISSING PERSONS, PREDOMINANTLY IN A MOUNTAIN ENVIRONMENT, BUT ALSO IN OTHER AREAS WHERE OUR SKILLS MAY BE OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.