Governing document POYNTON OPEN HANDS COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APR 1992 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2014 as amended on 27 Jun 2018 as amended on 28 Jun 2022 as amended on 28 Jun 2022 as amended on 28 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
To Promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community in the area of Poynton, East Cheshire and in particular the advancement of education, the promotion of good health and the distress arising therefrom
Area of benefit
POYNTON ADLINGTON AND DISLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.