Trustees BRIGHOUSE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1026831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Fredrick Jay | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Watson | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Knapton | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Indra Elaine Parkinson | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Ian Midgley | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS IAN WATSON | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Julie Bramley | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Robinson | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Wood | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jay | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.