Accounts and annual returns THE SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS AND CHOIRMASTERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1058118
Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 74 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 74 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 440 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 440 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 805 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 805 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 04 August 2020 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window