Governing document RAILWAY BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 29/12/1949, RULES AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 28/5/1951, PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 15 OF ROYAL CHARTER, AMENDMENTS APPROVED BY ORDER OF COUNCIL DATED 13/8/1965 AND 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED OR DISABLED OR NECESSITOUS RAILWAYMEN, THEIR SPOUSES OR CHILDREN, OR OTHER RELATIVES OR PERSONS WHO WERE IMMEDIATELY AND WHOLLY OR PARTLY DEPENDENT UPON THEM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.