Trustees THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS
Charity number: 206882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher O'Boyle | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chanaka Wanniarachchi | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abbey Addison | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Thomson-Smith | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Chong | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Garside | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Evans | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Shilston | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clive Hickman OBE FREng | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Richard Charles Bartlett Judge CEng | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Mary Eickhoff CEng | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Nowell CEng | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Giles Simeon Hartill CEng | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.