Trustees HENRY FAWCETT FUND
Charity number: 207772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Heather Mary Ann Atkinson | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Rixon | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
MARIA WYARD | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Philippa Ponniah | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW PAUL WALTON | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|||||||||
EDNA WATERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PAMELA HALUWA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.