Trustees THE CONCHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity number: 208205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Walker | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew James Law | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robin de Feu | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith Norman Alfred Alexander | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Amos Powell | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian James Goodwin | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Robbins | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Cousins | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Barfield | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Andrew Duncan Cameron | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Charmian Naomi Cavadino | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ron Carr | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNA HOLMES | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|||||
PETER TOPLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARTIN JOHN WILLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SEBASTIAN PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEN ROWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MIKE ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.