Governing document ACTION MEDICAL RESEARCH
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 MAY 1955 AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1959, 7 AUGUST 1990, 10 JULY 1996 AND 7 JULY 1999, AND 30 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 17 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, CURE, MANAGEMENT AND ALLEVIATION OF DISABLING DISEASES AND CONDITIONS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.