Trustees THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED
Charity number: 210262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Kristoffer Cooney | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieran George Lines | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wilkes | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Leung | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aleksa Asme | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Frazer Flintham | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cecelia Major | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Titilola Dawudu | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||
David Luff | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.