Trustees THE ROYAL UNITED KINGDOM BENEFICENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 210729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Julia Babette Sarah Neuberger | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Jannine Rosanne Edgar | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Letizia Perna | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joan Elliott | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Guillermo Pablo Donadini | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Caroline Glendinning | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Anderson | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Lucy Schwab Blythe | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Karen Elizabeth Byrne | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Amitkumar Nitin Patel | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.