Trustees ROYAL OPERA HOUSE COVENT GARDEN FOUNDATION
Charity number: 211775
Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philipp Freise | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Alex Younger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Ward | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janis Elizabeth Susskind | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Jane Burger | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Louise Britton | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lord John Browne | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Zeinab Badawi-Malik | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY BRIAN BUNTING | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Susan Hoyle | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Sir Lloyd Dorfman CBE | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.