Trustees MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 214958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MARK SMITH | Chair | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Gillian Anne Perkins | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Timothy Charles Raistrick | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Paul Neal Simmonds | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Christopher Charles Greenly | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Mark William Sayers | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Fiona Scott Murphy | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Sarah Jane O'Grady | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
SHEILA ALICE EDITH PRICE | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
MAUREEN ANNE LANCASTER | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
CAROLE ANN TAYLOR | Trustee | 11 July 2007 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
ALFRED WILLIAM MICHAEL LOVE | Trustee | 05 May 1987 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.