Trustees ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Charity number: 217439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Ross | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mathew Skinner | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Phillips | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Max Cope | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Vanda Barnard | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Elizabeth Murray | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Graham Hicks | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Jane Fawcett | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN MOORE MBE JP | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.