Governing document LEE'S REST HOUSES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20/06/1916 AS AMENDED BY OR VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 30/03/1945, 21/07/1959, 20/08/1968, 24/10/1983. AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
ACCOMODATION FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED OR CARRIED ON BUSINESS IN HULL FOR THE PRECEDING FIVE YEARS OR THE HUSBAND, WIFE OR DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH PERSON. PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN IN BETTER CIRCUMSTANCES, BUT WHO THROUGH MISFORTUNE OR SICKNESS HAVE BEEN REDUCED TO POVERTY OR COMPARATIVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.