Trustees THE ROYAL HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 222879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Charles Frederick Weed CBE | Chair | 31 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Claire Rose Austin | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Beesley | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Share | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tazim Essani | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kirkham | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Maynard | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wesley Albert Kerr | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Prof Nicola Spence | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|||||
JANET SHEILA WALKER | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Ruth Willmott | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Dunn | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate Lampard | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lindsey-Clark | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN CRAWLEY FRS | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID A H RAE | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Mary Southcombe Parker | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.