Trustees THE BRITISH ACADEMY FOR THE PROMOTION OF HISTORICAL PHILOSOPHICAL AND PHILOLOGICAL STUDIES
Charity number: 233176
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JULIA BLACK | Chair | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Patrick Haggard | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Judith Still | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lindsay Farmer | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Maxine Berg | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cyprian Broodbank | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor John Scott CBE | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Mandler | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elena Lieven | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Felix Driver | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graeme Barker | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian Christie | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rana Mitter | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Angela McRobbie | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marianne Elliott | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christina Boswell | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dauvit Bron | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bencie Woll | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR CONOR GEARTY | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Andrew Hurrell | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Isobel Armstrong | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ingrid De Smet | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Goldhill | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Swain | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sally Shuttleworth | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.