Governing document NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED AT MEETING OF 6TH JUNE 1964 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 25TH/26TH MAY 1974 AND 27TH MAY 1979 AND 29TH SEPTEMBER 2002, AND 25TH, 26TH SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 2 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THROUGH REPRESENTATION AND CAMPAIGNING, THE FEDERATION STRIVES TO IMPROVE ASPECTS AND QUALITY OF DAILY LIFE FOR ALL BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED, AND DEAF-BLIND PEOPLE AND THOSE WHOãS SIGHT IMPAIRMENT IS PART OF MULTI DISABILITY, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.