Trustees DR PLUMES TRUST
Charity number: 254048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROGER IVAN KNIGHT BD AKC | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Rev CLIVE WESLEY JONES | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Charlotte Lloyd-Evans | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Helen Marie Reeves | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev Paul Prentice | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Emma Young | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ted Hurst | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev NICHOLAS JOHN COOPER | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev GRAHAM VICTOR HERBERT | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||
KENNETH WILLIAM CLARK | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REV JIM FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Rev MARTIN JOHN HENWOOD DL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.