Trustees THE PIGGOTT CHARITY
Charity number: 257553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DAVID RIDOUT | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Dr Gary Christie | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
JONATHAN PAUL SAYERS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
JOHN BENJAMIN HART | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr RICHARD WILLIAM WOODHAMS | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
David Francis Stevens | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
RAYMOND ALEC SAUNDERS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILIP JOHN POCOCK | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
SAMUEL BENJAMIN COTTINGHAM | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
ANDREW JOHN COLLINS | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.