Governance THE SPIRITUALISTS' NATIONAL UNION
Charity number: 261898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 03 March 1971: Standard registration
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
- 02 February 2022: Funds received from 1163235 DEWSBURY SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
- 22 March 2022: Funds received from 237869 BATTERSEA SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
- 22 December 2023: Funds received from 1162994 SOUNDWELL ROAD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- SNU (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.