Trustees THE WYMONDHAM PLAYERS
Charity number: 266705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PERCIVAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Mary Christine Primrose | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rebecca Davis | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elizabeth TURNER | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Chris Baines | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tracey Hobbs | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Frances Harrod | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
AMANDA OELRICHS | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Georgette Vale | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.