Trustees THE ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE FUND
Charity number: 266780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELISABETH MENNA JONES | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rosaleen Clare Kerslake BA MBA CBE | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Esther Jane Robinson Wild | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Audrey Carlin | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Neal Ethan Sashore | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gregory David Pickup | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
James Robert Ketley Bowdidge | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Fisher | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Olivia Latimer | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Adebayo Temitope Peter Alao | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
David Hunter | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Suzanne Snowden | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Roy Hodson | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.