Trustees THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF DEVONSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 269363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS BALL | Chair | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTIN FRANCIS ELLIOTT | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
DR Reuben Christopher Simon Ayres DM, FRCP | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT CHARLES MUNRO | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
THOMAS BARRETT WHITE | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew William Albert Vodden MBE | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
COLIN CHARLES GALE | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
FRANK HANDSCOMBE | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID WHEATON | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MICHAEL GERVAS WALKER | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.