Governing document NORTHWICK PARK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE (RADIO NORTHWICK PARK)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/10/1977 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1983 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO HELP ALLEVIATE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT, HARROW AND EALING BY PROVIDING A BROADCASTING AND PATIENT VISITING SERVICE FOR LOCAL HOSPITALS AND BROADCASTING TO RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
HARROW AND WEMBLEY AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.