Trustees THE MAMMAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 278918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ferozah Mariam Mahmood | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Merryl Clare Parle-Gelling | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Richard Parker | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Derek Geoffrey Crawley | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Toney | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mitcheson | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie Wray | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy David Hounsome | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Hayns | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Lewns | Trustee | 06 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Dawn Millicent Scott | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruairidh Donald Campbell | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Craig Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rodger Douglas Pressland | Trustee | 27 October 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.