Trustees ANN CROWE'S AND WRIGHT'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Charity number: 279346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JANE ATTWOOD JP | Chair | 18 April 1991 |
|
|||||
Deighton Hargreaves | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Edwards | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Tanner | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Sophie Doran | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY STANLEY HILL | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|||||
ANNE WHITEHORN | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN F MCGRATH | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Michael Rye | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|||||
CHERYL BYAMUKAMA | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS MAUNDER TAYLOR | Trustee | 27 October 2003 |
|
|||||
JIM EUSTANCE | Trustee | 15 January 2002 |
|
|||||
CLIVE PARKER | Trustee | 16 October 1997 |
|
|||||
Dr PATRICK O'MAHONY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.