Trustees THE MILTON GLEE CLUB
Charity number: 286733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MINNELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Mather | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Upton | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HORNER | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Marcus Lee Saunders | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Husselby | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Madge Hull | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Moira Grigg | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ADAMS | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA GWYNETH STIMPSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.