Trustees LANDSCAPE RESEARCH GROUP
Charity number: 287160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Theano S Terkenli | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mengyixin Li | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jens Ruben HAENDELER | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Barbara BYER | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian LAWSON | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Merham Mohamed Hosny Anwar KELEG | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juliette DESPORTES | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Ruth JONES | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Laura Alice WATT | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Caleb MELL | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY LAURENCE WATERMAN | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marouen Hedhli | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HANNES PALANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof. EMMA LOUISE WATERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.