Trustees SOUTH WEST ESSEX CHOIR
Charity number: 289613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANISSA MSALLEM | Chair |
|
||||||||
David Heil Hampton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Katheryn Ronnau-Bradbeer | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Margaret Williams | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Vanessa Watling | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Maurice YOUNG | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARY CHRISTINE MCELARNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSANNAH FRANCES PICKERING-SAQQA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAUREEN GALLOWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN CHARLES BRIDGER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.