Trustees RICHMOND UPON THAMES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 289912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL FIELDER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Annette | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Meredith Wincott | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Hardy | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Lisa Wilson | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Dixon | Trustee | 08 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Tim Grebot | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
SARAH LOUISE KERSHAW | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
NIGEL JEREMY WAINE | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PAUL BREWER | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHIL HUNT | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GILL BREWER | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK LEOPOLD DUCKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER ALBERT STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.