Trustees VIVA CHAMBER ORCHESTRA LTD
Charity number: 291046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Alfred Peter Davis | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Kieran Alexander Morgan-McGeehan | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Emily Claire Lonsdale | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cookhorn | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stewart Geary | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Nicklin | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Lars Muldal | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Warrick Nathan Matthews | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JOHN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.