Trustees 1ST ASH VALE SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305683
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christa Scott-Fernandez | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Brodie | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dibsdall | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Bunting | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lucas | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Armitage | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Muirhead | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Katherine Lester | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Baker | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Jackson | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY HOOKER | Trustee | 14 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN GARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRIS FITZPATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Linda Christine Moyle | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARBARA VERONICA ELSA SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA HELEN WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.