Trustees RAVENGLASS AND ESKDALE RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY TRUST
Charity number: 1067272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Graham Clayton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Nicholas Johnson | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Jackman | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Kathryn Clare Bressenden | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID LEES | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD ROBINSON | Trustee | 19 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
NEAL GLOVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID WILLIAM MOSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JACQULENE PHARAOH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAIN ALDRED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER VAN ZELLER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STUART HARRISON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr DIANA SUSAN CHASE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.