Governing document WELLS CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 APRIL 1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 10 MARCH 1997, AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2000, AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 2002, 15 MARCH 2004,24/03/06 AND 10 DECEMBER 2007. as amended on 10 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY SUCH MEANS AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND BY OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.