Governing document CHADACRE AGRICULTURAL TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST AND CONSTITUTION DATED 26 JULY 1920 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED 22 AUGUST 1949 10 SEPTEMBER 1976 AND 2 FEBRUARY 1976 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 5TH SEPTEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF AGRICULTURE AND FARMING INCLUDING THEIR GENERAL IMPROVEMENT AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SKILLS AND INDUSTRIES IN AGRICULTURE AND FARMING AND IN ALL TRADES AND PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH THEM.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.