Trustees THE ROYAL ALEXANDRA AND ALBERT SCHOOL
Charity number: 311945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID Thomas FRANK | Chair | 18 December 2011 |
|
|||||
Ryan Ramsey | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hodgkin | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Black | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ononuju Irukwu | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stephen Griffin | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tadd | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nishma Acharya | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD WINTER | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Wates | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BILLINGHAM | Trustee | 21 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WELLS | Trustee | 20 June 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.