Governing document OUTWARD BOUND GLOBAL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 1946 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 APRIL 1950, 23 JULY 1975 18 JULY 1986, 29 OCTOBER 1986, 12 FEBRUARY 1997, 14 OCTOBER 2004 & 11 DECEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN A WIDE VARIETY OF ACTIVITIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PHYSICAL ENDEAVOUR IN THE OUTDOORS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.