Accounts and annual returns THE WINGATE SPECIAL CHILDRENS TRUST
Charity number: 327713
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 228 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 228 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 17 May 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 17 May 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window