Trustees ESHER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1063001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Adrian Burrows | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Bishop | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Andrew Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David William Vorbrich | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
LISA MARIE CROSS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES DALEY | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Valter | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Elaine Needham | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ernest | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|||||
CHARLES PETER HANNA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.