Trustees THE FRIENDS OF LYTHAM HALL
Charity number: 1069442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAMBERT LEIF DOPPING-HEPENSTAL | Chair | 07 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
John David Hornyak | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Wood | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Kitt | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jones BEM | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Havenhand | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE JONES | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||
PAULINE HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHRYN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GUFFOGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MEG HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.