Trustees ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (NORWICH BRANCH)
Charity number: 1068699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CHARLES PHILLIPS | Chair | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Barber | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Hall | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ROSALIND Sadler | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
LT CDR STUART REGINALD FIDLER | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP COATES | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE PATRICK CHARLES TOWNSEND | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ROY MIZEN | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.