Trustees THE FRIENDS OF TRURO CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 1072511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Barnes Cockeram | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Smith | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
The Very Reverend Simon Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lingham | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hare | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hare | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lady Deidre Neale | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Neil Welton | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.