Trustees 33RD SHEFFIELD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1069378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Haglington | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donna Danielle Waldock | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie James | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Connors | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Blunkett | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Westney | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Justin Blackburn | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Susan Blackburn | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tony Wharam | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Neil Raymond Bromley | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Hardman | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.