Trustees THE COLLEGE OF THE LADY FRANCES SIDNEY SUSSEX IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Charity number: 1137586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Martin James Burton | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yuqing Chen | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr BERNHARD FULDA | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Olivia Catherine Woods | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Hygate | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Dirk Pierce | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sergii Strelchuk | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eugenio Biagini | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Patricia Sumnall | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward Wilson-Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Nicholas | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Benedict Lambert | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Cordelia Theed Groom | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rohan Tissa Ranasinghe | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mette Eilstrup-Sangiovanni | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Ricardo Garcia-Mayoral | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fernando Lusa Bordin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Doran | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MASSIMO BEBER M.PHIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.