Governance THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMITTEE FOR UNICEF
Charity number: 1072612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 26 November 1998: Standard registration
- 24 February 2017: Funds received from 1125250 THE M M B FOUNDATION
- 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
- 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 07 June 2023: Funds received from 1038063 SKCV CHILDREN'S TRUST (UK)
- 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1103475 CENTRAL RELIEF FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- UNICEF UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.