Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL CATHEDRAL
Charity number: 1078149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK BURGESS | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Rev Charles Philip Richard Moth | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr SANDRA DIANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
margaret burgess | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
NICHOLA ANNE HUDSON | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Sandra Diane Williams | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARIA WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARTIN HALL | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Charles Sommer | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAUL WALKER | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARGARET BAMFORD | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
ELIZABETH MCCOMBE | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
NIGEL CORBY | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarah Margaret Kilmartin | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr JAMES MICHAEL MEADE WALSH | Trustee | 18 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
MICHAEL BARRY HEATHCOTE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.