Trustees BELVEDERE TRUST
Charity number: 1078667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John David Cracknell | Chair |
|
||||||
Sara Victoria Rose Langridge | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Gabriele | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roditi | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Klaber | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Viscount John Clive Mackintosh of Halifax | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Hene | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.