Trustees CUCKOOS NEST
Charity number: 1090934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Lawton | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ackroyd | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Lorraine Soothill | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Elliot | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hilary Mellor | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mx Phoenix Nixon | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary White | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aine Welsh | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.